VA HB2142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Child care tax credit. Establishes an individual nonrefundable income tax credit for taxable years 2020 and 2021 of up to $1,000 per taxable year for eligible child care expenses incurred and paid between September 1, 2020, and July 1, 2021, due to the closure of Virginia child care facilities or primary or secondary schools as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic. If the amount of the credit exceeds the taxpayer's tax liability for the taxable year in which the child care expenses were incurred and paid, such excess may be carried over for five years. The taxpayer must verify their eligible child-care expenses when claiming the credit in each taxable year pursuant to guidelines promulgated by the Department of Taxation.
Title
Child care tax credit; establishes an individual nonrefundable income tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100666D |