VA HB2142 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voting systems; use of direct recording electronic machines. Prohibits the use of direct recording electronic (DRE) machines in elections on and after July 1, 2016, except for the express purpose of providing accessible voting equipment as required by law. The bill allows the modification of previously acquired DREs for the express purpose of providing accessible voting equipment.
Title
Voting systems; use of direct recording electronic machines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101352D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2142 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2142+hil |