VA HB2141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax; filing tax returns by overnight delivery service. Places filing of tax returns by overnight delivery service in the same category as filing by U.S. mail for timely filing purposes.
Title
Tax returns; filing by overnight delivery service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368) | |
2011-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 368 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2141ER) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102327D |