VA HB2139 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2139

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Accrual of cause of action; diagnosis of latent injury. Provides that a cause of action for a latent injury resulting from the exposure to a substance or the use of a product shall accrue when the person knew or should have known of the injury and its causal connection to an injury-causing substance or product. Accrual of cause of action; diagnosis of latent injury. Provides that a cause of action for a latent injury resulting from the exposure to a substance or the use of a product shall accrue when the person knew or should have known of the injury and its causal connection to an injury-causing substance or product.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accrual of cause of action; diagnosis of latent injury.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 195 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2139ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 21200305D-S1 (95-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate with substitute (30-Y 8-N)
2021-02-22SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2139S1
2021-02-22SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21200305D-S1
2021-02-22SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
2021-02-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200305D-S1
2021-02-15SenateReconsidered by Judiciary
2021-02-10SenatePassed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (13-Y 2-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 21102437D-E
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2139E
2021-01-29HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
2021-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102437D

Same As/Similar To

HB2139 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801249(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2139
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2139+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2139E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2139S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2139ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0195+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2139AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/.htm
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200163D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200305D.pdf
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0802C0015+HB2139
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H08C0111+HB2139
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1282+HB2139
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03C0160+HB2139
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0019+HB2139
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0060+HB2139
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2139+HB2139
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0286HB2139+HB2139
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1886+HB2139

Bill Comments

feedback