VA HB2139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commissioner of Highways; annual report requirements. Requires that the Commissioner of Highways, in his annual report, report specifically about transportation projects approved or modified during the prior fiscal year and include a listing of the total number of lane miles of all primary and secondary roads that have been resurfaced and all primary and secondary roads that are rated "poor" or "very poor."
Title
Highways, Commissioner of; annual report requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 537 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2139ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2139H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104766D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104766D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Reconsidered by Transportation |
2017-01-31 | House | Removed from table in Transportation by voice vote |
2017-01-26 | House | Tabled in Transportation by voice vote |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102308D |