VA HB2137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Persons who are deaf or hard of hearing; terminology. Replaces the term "hearing impaired" and its variations with "deaf or hard of hearing" and "hearing loss" throughout the Code of Virginia. The bill also renames the Virginia Hearing Impairment Identification and Monitoring System as the Virginia Hearing Loss Identification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Persons who are deaf or hard of hearing; replaces certain terminology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2137ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 19101301D-E
2019-01-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2137E
2019-01-25HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-25HouseRead second time
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101301D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192152.4:3(n/a)See Bill Text
221213(n/a)See Bill Text
221214(n/a)See Bill Text
221217.01(n/a)See Bill Text
221319(n/a)See Bill Text
326528(n/a)See Bill Text
32164.1(n/a)See Bill Text
32164.2(n/a)See Bill Text
462342(n/a)See Bill Text
51544(n/a)See Bill Text
51545(n/a)See Bill Text
5412600(n/a)See Bill Text
801384.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback