VA HB2136 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; mobile retailer license. Creates a mobile retailer license, which authorizes the licensee to sell wine and beer during events within designated areas for on-premises consumption or in closed containers for off-premises consumption. The bill requires such licensees to (i) comply with any requirements or limitations imposed by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority and (ii) serve food, prepared on or off premises, whenever wine or beer is served. The bill allows such licenses to be granted to persons operating a mobile retail venture that sells wine or beer to patrons at special events or private gatherings through trucks or trailers equipped with no more than four beverage taps.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; mobile retailer license created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100761D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |