VA HB2136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Evidence; accident reconstruction; criminal cases. Provides that in any criminal case, an accident reconstruction expert, when properly qualified, may testify as an expert witness in a court of law subject to the Rules of Supreme Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Evidence; accident reconstruction, criminal cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N) (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateFailed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2136H1
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104837D-H1
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104837D-H1
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100742D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192270.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback