VA HB2135 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; early termination of rental agreement; victims of sexual abuse or criminal sexual assault. Provides that a tenant who is a victim of sexual abuse or other criminal sexual assault may terminate such tenant's obligations under a rental agreement if the tenant (i) has obtained a protective order and has given proper written notice of termination during the period of the protective order or any extension thereof or (ii) as evidence of such abuse or criminal sexual assault, has obtained (a) records or files from a federal or state agency, law-enforcement agency, or court; (b) documentation from a domestic violence or sexual assault program; or (c) documentation from a religious, medical, or other professional and has given written notice of termination. Under current law, there must be a conviction before the tenant may terminate such obligations under a rental agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; early termination of rental agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in General Laws
2023-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2023-01-18HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100420D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511236(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback