VA HB2135 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2135

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certain school boards; student meals; participation in the Afterschool Meal Program. Requires each school board that governs a local school division that has a student population that qualifies for free and reduced-price meals at a minimum percentage of 50 percent in the prior school year and simultaneously offers educational or enrichment activities and is consequently eligible to participate in the Afterschool Meal Program administered by the U.S. Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service (FNS) Child and Adult Care Food Program to apply to the Department of Education to participate in the Afterschool Meal Program for each such school to subsequently and simultaneously serve federally reimbursable meals and offer an afterschool education or enrichment program, pursuant to FNS guidelines and state health and safety standards. The bill requires the Department of Education to administer the Afterschool Meal Program on behalf of the U.S. Department of Agriculture. The bill provides that the Superintendent of Public Instruction shall issue a waiver to this requirement upon determination that participation is not financially viable for a school or group of schools. The bill requires the Department of Education to develop a process and criteria for evaluating such waivers. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards, certain; participation in the Afterschool Meal Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 11-N) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 7/1/22)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2135ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (89-Y 11-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (89-Y 11-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102541D

Same As/Similar To

HB2135 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221207.4:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2135
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2135+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2135ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0292+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2135F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2135FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0901C0063+HB2135
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09C0043+HB2135
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1233+HB2135
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0140+HB2135
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0046+HB2135
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2135+HB2135
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0266HB2135+HB2135

Bill Comments

feedback