VA HB2135 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Notaries; qualifications; conviction of a felony. Provides that a person who has been convicted of a Class 5 or Class 6 felony and who has successfully fulfilled all conditions of sentencing of such felony may be eligible to be commissioned as a notary.
Title
Notaries; qualifications, conviction of a felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102919D |