VA HB2134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Private security services businesses; qualifications; felony convictions. Limits to Class 5 or Class 6 felonies the felony convictions for which the Director of the Department of Criminal Justice Services, upon written request, may waive the prohibition against a person with a felony conviction being (i) employed as a registered or certified employee by a private security services business or training school or (ii) issued a private security services registration; a certification as an unarmed security officer, electronic security employee, or technician's assistant; a private security services training school or instructor certification; a compliance agent certification; or a private security services business license. The bill conditions waiver of the prohibition for a person convicted of a Class 5 or Class 6 felony upon such person's having been pardoned for such felony or having successfully fulfilled all conditions of sentencing for such felony and having had his civil rights restored, including his firearm rights. Under current law, the Director may waive such prohibition for a person convicted of any felony; the bill retains the Director's authority to waive such prohibition for a person convicted of certain misdemeanors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private security services businesses; qualifications, felony convictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 1-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102909D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91139(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback