VA HB2134 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local law-enforcement agencies; body-worn cameras. Requires localities to adopt and establish a written policy for the operation of a body-worn camera system, as defined in the bill, that conforms to the model policy established by the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) prior to purchasing or deploying a body-worn camera system. The bill requires the Department to establish a model policy for the operation of body-worn camera systems and the storage and maintenance of body-worn camera system records.
Title
Law-enforcement agencies, local; body-worn cameras.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102388D |
Subjects
Commonwealth Public Safety
Counties Cities and Towns
Criminal Justice Services
Criminal Procedure
Police
Counties Cities and Towns
Criminal Justice Services
Criminal Procedure
Police
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2134 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2134+hil |