VA HB2134 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; state agencies to post schedule of costs for producing records. Adds a requirement that each state public body created in the executive branch of state government and subject to FOIA make available to the public upon request a schedule of charges associated with the production of requested records that may be assessed by the public body under FOIA. The bill also requires the schedule of charges to be posted on the respective websites of state executive branch agencies.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; state agencies to post schedule of costs for producing records.
Sponsors
Del. Onzlee Ware [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102618D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2134 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2134+hil |