VA HB2132 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cutting of grass; James City County. Adds James City County to the list of localities that may enforce a grass cutting ordinance on occupied property. The existing general provisions apply to vacant property only.
Title
Grass and weeds; adds James City County to list authorized to require cutting on occupied property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 695 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2132ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102508D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1354 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0542)