VA HB2130 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2130

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia LGBTQ+ Advisory Board. Establishes the Virginia LGBTQ+ Advisory Board to advise the Governor regarding the economic, professional, cultural, educational, and governmental links between the Commonwealth and the LGBTQ+ community in Virginia and sets out the powers and duties of the Board. The Board shall be composed of 21 nonlegislative citizen members, at least 15 of whom shall identify as LGBTQ+, to be appointed by the Governor, and the Secretaries of the Commonwealth, Commerce and Trade, Education, Health and Human Resources, and Public Safety and Homeland Security, or their designees, who shall serve as ex officio members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia LGBTQ+ Advisory Board; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 169 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2130ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 2-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N)
2021-01-21HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-20HouseRead first time
2021-01-19HouseReported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102200D

Same As/Similar To

HB2130 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222499.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222499.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2130
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2130+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2130ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0169+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2130F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2130FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11C0035+HB2130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1012+HB2130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0145+HB2130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0060+HB2130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2130+HB2130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0285HB2130+HB2130

Bill Comments

feedback