VA HB2128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Telemedicine; physicians licensed in contiguous jurisdictions. Authorizes a person licensed to practice medicine or osteopathy who is in good standing with the applicable regulatory agency of a jurisdiction that is contiguous to the Commonwealth to provide health care services to patients located in the Commonwealth through use of telemedicine services.
Title
Telemedicine; physicians licensed in contiguous jurisdictions.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104114D |