VA HB2128 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; small procurements; localities. Provides that local public bodies are not required to post on the Department of General Services' central electronic procurement website for small purchase procurements.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; small procurements.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 502 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2128ER) |
2013-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102189D |