VA HB2126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; step therapy protocols. Requires carriers issuing health benefit plans that develop step therapy protocols for a health benefit plan to ensure that those step therapy protocols are (i) developed and endorsed by a multidisciplinary panel of experts that manages conflicts of interest among the members; (ii) based on peer-reviewed research and medical practice; and (iii) continually updated based on a review of new evidence, research, and newly developed treatments. The measure requires that when coverage of a prescription drug for the treatment of a medical condition is restricted for use by a carrier or utilization review organization through the use of a step therapy protocol, the patient and prescribing provider have access to a clear, readily accessible, and convenient process to request a step therapy exception. The measure establishes conditions under which a request for a step therapy exception shall be granted and authorizes a patient to appeal a step therapy exception request denial. The provisions of the measure shall apply to any health benefit plan delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident and sickness insurance; step therapy protocols.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Finance Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 1/1/20)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2126ER)
2019-02-23HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-21SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2019-02-21SenateFinance Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateRead third time
2019-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-18SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2126H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106082D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106082D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 1-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102027D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.9:05(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2126
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2126+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2126H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2126ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0337+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1401V0021+HB2126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0047+HB2126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2468+HB2126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0177+HB2126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0390+HB2126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2126+HB2126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3253+HB2126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0959HB2126+HB2126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0960HB2126+HB2126

Bill Comments

feedback