VA HB2125 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; preregistration for persons 16 years of age or older. Permits a person who is otherwise qualified to register to vote and is 16 years of age or older, but who will not be 18 years of age on or before the day of the next general election, to preregister to vote. The preregistration does not entitle such person to vote in any election except as already permitted by law. The bill requires the Department of Elections to maintain a record of all preregistered voters in the Virginia voter registration system, which shall automatically register a person who is preregistered upon that person reaching 18 years or age or becoming eligible for advance registration as already permitted by law, whichever comes first. The bill requires the Department to provide to the general registrars voter confirmation documents for such voters. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2022. Voter registration; preregistration for persons 16 years of age or older. Permits a person who is otherwise qualified to register to vote and is 16 years of age or older, but who will not be 18 years of age on or before the day of the next general election, to preregister to vote. The preregistration does not entitle such person to vote in any election except as already permitted by law. The bill requires the Department of Elections to maintain a record of all preregistered voters in the Virginia voter registration system, which shall automatically register a person who is preregistered upon that person reaching 18 years or age or becoming eligible for advance registration as already permitted by law, whichever comes first. The bill requires the Department to provide to the general registrars voter confirmation documents for such voters. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; preregistration for persons 16 years of age or older, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
2021-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 21100907D-E
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2125E
2021-01-29HousePending question ordered
2021-01-29HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Voting Rights
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100907D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242403.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242404(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2125
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2125+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2125E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2125AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103322A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2125F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2125FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1806V0002+HB2125
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H18V0023+HB2125
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1309+HB2125
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S08V0065+HB2125

Bill Comments

feedback