VA HB2125 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of unmanned aircraft systems by public bodies; search warrant required. Replaces the moratorium currently set to expire on July 1, 2015, on the use of unmanned aircraft systems by state and local law-enforcement and regulatory entities, except in defined emergency situations or in training exercises related to such situations, with an absolute prohibition on the use of unmanned aircraft systems by such law-enforcement and regulatory entities unless a search warrant has been obtained prior to such use. The warrant requirement does not apply to (i) utilization of such systems to support the Commonwealth for purposes other than law enforcement; (ii) certain search and rescue operations; (iii) certain Virginia National Guard and United States Armed Forces functions; (iv) research and development conducted by institutions of higher education or other research organizations; or (v) the use of unmanned aircraft systems for private, commercial, or recreational use.
Title
Use of unmanned aircraft systems; search warrant required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (69-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 69-N) (Y: 28 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 69-N) (Y: 28 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764) | |
2015-04-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 764 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 18-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (69-Y 28-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed in enrolled form (69-Y 28-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 69-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (28-Y 69-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2125ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2125H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104099D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Incorporates HB2077 |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104099D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102572D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2077 (Similar To) 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice