VA HB2123 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of funeral services; exception for sale of caskets. Provides that the sale of caskets by a wholesale distributor that operates a retail establishment for the purpose of selling caskets directly to the public does not constitute the practice of funeral services.
Title
Funeral services; practice does not include sale of caskets.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101089D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2123 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2123+hil |