VA HB2123 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; certain students; financial assistance programs. Provides that students who meet the criteria to be deemed eligible for in-state tuition regardless of their citizenship or immigration status shall be afforded the same educational benefits, including financial assistance programs administered by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, the State Board for Community Colleges, or a public institution of higher education, as any other individual who is eligible for in-state tuition. The bill has a delayed effective date of August 1, 2022, and directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, in coordination with institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth, to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. Public institutions of higher education; certain students; financial assistance programs. Provides that students who meet the criteria to be deemed eligible for in-state tuition regardless of their citizenship or immigration status shall be afforded the same educational benefits, including financial assistance programs administered by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, the State Board for Community Colleges, or a public institution of higher education, as any other individual who is eligible for in-state tuition. The bill has a delayed effective date of August 1, 2022, and directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, in coordination with institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth, to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students; eligibility for in-state tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (58-Y 42-N)
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2123H1
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103245D-H1
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 6-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
2021-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2021-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103245D-H1
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102859D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231505.1(n/a)See Bill Text
231506(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2123
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2123+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2123H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103245D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103245.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2123F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2123FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0902V0004+HB2123
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H09V0035+HB2123
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0206V0002+HB2123
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0034+HB2123
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1307+HB2123
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0146+HB2123

Bill Comments 750

feedback