VA HB2121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Bail; data collection and reporting standards; report. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to (i) collect data relating to bail determinations for any person who is held in custody pending trial or hearing for an offense, civil or criminal contempt or otherwise, in every locality; (ii) create a uniform reporting mechanism for criminal justice agencies to submit such data; and (iii) submit an annual report on the data collected to the Governor and the General Assembly, as well as publish the annual report on the Department's website. The bill also provides that the law addressing bail is to be construed so as to give effect to a general presumption in favor of pretrial release.
Title
Bail; data collection and reporting standards, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104006D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 119.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 134.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |