VA HB2121 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Bail; data collection and reporting standards; report. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to (i) collect data relating to bail determinations for any person who is held in custody pending trial or hearing for an offense, civil or criminal contempt or otherwise, in every locality; (ii) create a uniform reporting mechanism for criminal justice agencies to submit such data; and (iii) submit an annual report on the data collected to the Governor and the General Assembly, as well as publish the annual report on the Department's website. The bill also provides that the law addressing bail is to be construed so as to give effect to a general presumption in favor of pretrial release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail; data collection and reporting standards, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104006D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192119.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192134.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback