VA HB2121 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; members of the Virginia National Guard. Provides that any member of the Virginia National Guard residing in Virginia shall be eligible for in-state tuition at a public institution of higher education.
Title
Tuition, in-state; members of the Virginia National Guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101814D |