VA HB212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provision of abortion; right to informed consent. Requires physicians and authorized nurse practitioners to follow certain procedures and processes to effect a pregnant woman's informed written consent prior to the performance of an abortion. Provision of abortion; right to informed consent. Requires physicians and authorized nurse practitioners to follow certain procedures and processes to effect a pregnant woman's informed written consent prior to the performance of an abortion.
Title
Abortion; right to informed consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB212H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106074D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106074D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 8-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103675D |