VA HB2119 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of laser hair removal. Limits the practice of laser hair removal to a properly trained person licensed to practice medicine or osteopathic medicine or licensed as a physician assistant or nurse practitioner or to a properly trained person under the direction and supervision of a licensed doctor of medicine or osteopathic medicine or physician assistant or nurse practitioner.
Title
Laser hair removal; limits practice.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2119ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Engrossed bill reprinted 17102330D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102330D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2119E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102330D |