VA HB2117 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Children's Services Act; special education programs. Requires that funds expended for special education services under the Children's Services Act only be expended on educational programs that are licensed by the Department of Education. The bill adds children and youth previously placed in approved private school educational programs for at least six months who will receive transitional services, as that term is defined in the bill, in a public school setting to the target population for eligibility for the state pool of funds, provided, however, that such funds shall be allocated for such transitional services for no longer than 12 months. The bill requires the Secretary of Education, in conjunction with the Office of Children's Services and the Department of Education, to establish a work group (the Work Group) with, at minimum, certain identified stakeholders to develop a detailed plan to direct the transfer of Children's Services Act funds currently reserved for children requiring an educational placement in a private special education day school or residential facility to the Department of Education and to develop a standardized reporting process, template, and reporting requirement for private special education day school tuition rates to ensure that tuition rates can be accurately compared across schools and over time, among other duties. The bill requires that the Work Group submit its plan and recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations by November 1, 2021. Children's Services Act; special education programs. Requires that funds expended for special education services under the Children's Services Act only be expended on educational programs that are licensed by the Department of Education. The bill adds children and youth previously placed in approved private school educational programs for at least six months who will receive transitional services, as that term is defined in the bill, in a public school setting to the target population for eligibility for the state pool of funds, provided, however, that such funds shall be allocated for such transitional services for no longer than 12 months. The bill requires the Secretary of Education, in conjunction with the Office of Children's Services and the Department of Education, to establish a work group (the Work Group) with, at minimum, certain identified stakeholders to develop a detailed plan to direct the transfer of Children's Services Act funds currently reserved for children requiring an educational placement in a private special education day school or residential facility to the Department of Education and to develop a standardized reporting process, template, and reporting requirement for private special education day school tuition rates to ensure that tuition rates can be accurately compared across schools and over time, among other duties. The bill requires that the Work Group submit its plan and recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations by November 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Services Act; funds expended special education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2117H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103572D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2021-01-27HouseIncorporates HB2211 (Plum)
2021-01-27HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103572D-H1
2021-01-27HouseReported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2021-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-19HouseReferred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102547D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225211(n/a)See Bill Text
225212(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2117
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2117+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2117H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103572D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103572.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2117F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2117FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0903V0013+HB2117
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H09V0047+HB2117
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0203V0002+HB2117
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0082+HB2117
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1391+HB2117
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0133+HB2117

Bill Comments

feedback