VA HB2115 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; definition of postmark; legibility requirement. Requires an absentee ballot returned to the general registrar after the closing of the polls on election day to be legibly postmarked on or before the date of the election in order to be counted. Current law does not specify that the postmark must be legible. The bill defines postmark, for purposes of absentee ballots returned after the closing of the polls on election day, to mean (i) an official United States Postal Service imprint indicating the date of mailing or any other official indicia of the United States Postal Service used to identify the date of mailing or (ii) the mailing confirmation data of a commercial delivery service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; definition of postmark, legibility requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101219D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242709(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback