VA HB2114 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; tuition and financial aid; dependency override application form. Requires each public institution of higher education to create and maintain a form by which a student may apply for a dependency override, defined in the bill as the documented determination by a financial aid administrator pursuant to relevant federal law that, for the purposes of tuition and financial aid eligibility determinations, a student is an independent student by reason of other unusual circumstances. The bill requires such form to (i) be published electronically on the financial aid page of the institution's website; (ii) clearly explain, in language understandable to a student enrolled at the institution, the purposes of a dependency override, potential circumstances that may qualify a student for a dependency override, and common circumstances that do not qualify a student for a dependency override; (iii) explicitly include, in language understandable to a student enrolled at the institution, a statement that institutions of higher education are permitted to accept a range of documents to substantiate dependency override applications, including those documents specified by relevant federal law; and (iv) explicitly include, in language understandable to a student enrolled at the institution, the option to apply for a dependency override based on certain factors enumerated in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; tuition & financial aid, dependency override application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Appropriations
2023-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2023-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2023-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 23105098D-H1
2023-01-25HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2023-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2023-01-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103845D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231501.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback