VA HB2113 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Automatic expungement of criminal records; penalties. Establishes a process for the automatic expungement, defined in the bill, of criminal records for certain convictions, deferred dispositions, and acquittals and for offenses that have been nolle prossed or otherwise dismissed. The bill also provides a process for the automatic expungement of criminal records for charges arising from mistaken identity or the unauthorized use of identifying information. The bill has staggered delayed effective dates in order to develop systems for implementing the provisions of the bill. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. Automatic expungement of criminal records; penalties. Establishes a process for the automatic expungement, defined in the bill, of criminal records for certain convictions, deferred dispositions, and acquittals and for offenses that have been nolle prossed or otherwise dismissed. The bill also provides a process for the automatic expungement of criminal records for charges arising from mistaken identity or the unauthorized use of identifying information. The bill has staggered delayed effective dates in order to develop systems for implementing the provisions of the bill. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Criminal records; establishes a process for automatic expungement, etc., report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (60-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2113H2 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21103933D-H2 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee on Courts of Justice substitute rejected 21103298D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103933D-H2 |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103298D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102655D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2113 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 293.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 323 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 310.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 390 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 72 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 74 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |