VA HB211 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ground water withdrawal permit term; lengthening to 15 years; permit fee. Lengthens from 10 years to 15 years the maximum term of a ground water withdrawal permit issued by the State Water Control Board. The bill also lengthens from 10 years to 15 years the maximum term of a ground water withdrawal special exception and directs the Board to raise the applicable permit fee from $6,000 to $9,000. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Ground water withdrawal permit term; lengthening to 15 years, permit fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 424 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB211ER) |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB211H1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105324D-H1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105324D-H1 |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100685D |