VA HB2109 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services; membership. Expands the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services by adding as an at-large member an expert in companion animal welfare who is employed by a releasing agency in the Commonwealth. Under current law, the Board is composed of one member from each congressional district, of which there are 11, two at-large members engaged in the application or sale of pesticides, and two ex officio members.
Title
Agriculture and Consumer Services, Board of; expands membership.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101405D |