VA HB2108 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Wireless Services Authority Act; rates and charges. Provides that a wireless services authority may fix rates, fees, and charges for services provided, or facilities owned, operated, or maintained by the authority, for which the authority has received loan funding. Currently, an authority may do so only if it has issued revenue bonds. A similar change authorizes rates to be set at levels to provide for payment of loans. The measure also requires each authority to maintain records demonstrating compliance with certain provisions and to make the records available for inspection and copying by the public pursuant to the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Virginia Wireless Services Authority Act; rates and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 24-N 1-A) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 24-N 1-A) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 389 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2108ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 13-N 1-A) |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (79-Y 13-N 1-A) |
2017-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 24-N 1-A) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 24-N 1-A) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2108H2 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105141D-H2 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105141D-H2 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 9-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Draft Committee substitute printed to LIS only 17104749D-H1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103873D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1458 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 276.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |