VA HB2107 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health Insurance Reform Commission; Bureau of Insurance assessment. Provides that the Chairman of the standing committee requesting the Health Insurance Reform Commission (the Commission) to assess a proposed mandated health insurance benefit or provider shall send a copy of such request to the Bureau of Insurance of the State Corporation Commission (the Bureau). The bill requires the Bureau to prepare an analysis of the proposed mandate upon receipt of the copy of the request. Current law requires the Commission to request the Bureau to prepare such assessment. The bill repeals the July 1, 2017, sunset provision for the Health Insurance Reform Commission.
Title
Health Insurance Reform Commission; assessment sent to Bureau of Insurance.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 485 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2107ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103249D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Health Insurance
Insurance
State Corporation Commission
General Assembly
Health Insurance
Insurance
State Corporation Commission