VA HB2106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Naming state highways, bridges, interchanges, and other transportation facilities; living persons. Provides that the Commonwealth Transportation Board may name highways, bridges, interchanges, and other transportation facilities after living or deceased persons.
Title
State highways, bridges, interchanges, etc.;
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101404D |