VA HB2106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board of Workforce Development. Revises the composition of the Virginia Board of Workforce Development (Board) to conform to requirements of the federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act (WIOA). One member shall be a representative of a private career college. The measure also (i) specifies that funding for a full-time Executive Director position shall be provided by Title I of the WIOA and (ii) replaces a requirement that industry credentials that align with high-demand occupations shall include the Career Readiness Certificate with the requirement that such industry credentials include a credential that determines career readiness. The measure shall not become effective if prior to July 1, 2017, the U.S. Department of Labor grants a waiver of the State Board membership composition requirements under the federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act that permits the Board to continue with its current composition.
Title
Workforce Development, Virginia Board of; revises composition of Board.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)_ (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)_ (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 265 (effective - see bill) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2106ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)_ |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102049D-E |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2106E |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102049D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Labor and Employment
Workforce
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Labor and Employment
Workforce
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2471 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2471.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2472 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |