VA HB2105 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2105

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Early childhood education; quality rating and improvement system participation; School Readiness Committee. Delays until the 2022–2023 school year the requirement for all publicly funded early childhood education providers to participate in a quality rating and improvement system to be established by the Board of Education by July 1, 2021. The bill also delays from the fall of 2023 to the fall of 2024 the publication of initial quality ratings for such providers. The bill reinstates the School Readiness Committee and alters the composition and scope of the work of the School Readiness Committee. Early childhood education; quality rating and improvement system participation; School Readiness Committee. Delays until the 2022–2023 school year the requirement for all publicly funded early childhood education providers to participate in a quality rating and improvement system to be established by the Board of Education by July 1, 2021. The bill also delays from the fall of 2023 to the fall of 2024 the publication of initial quality ratings for such providers. The bill reinstates the School Readiness Committee and alters the composition and scope of the work of the School Readiness Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early childhood education; quality rating and improvement system participation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2105ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102419D

Same As/Similar To

HB2105 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22208.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2105
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2105+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2105ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0446+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2105F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2105FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0901C0067+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09C0041+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1218+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0136+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0048+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2105+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0266HB2105+HB2105

Bill Comments

feedback