VA HB2105 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2105
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Early childhood education; quality rating and improvement system participation; School Readiness Committee. Delays until the 2022%962023 school year the requirement for all publicly funded early childhood education providers to participate in a quality rating and improvement system to be established by the Board of Education by July 1, 2021. The bill also delays from the fall of 2023 to the fall of 2024 the publication of initial quality ratings for such providers. The bill reinstates the School Readiness Committee and alters the composition and scope of the work of the School Readiness Committee.
Title
Early childhood education; quality rating and improvement system participation.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102419D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2105 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)