VA HB2105 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Investment of Public Funds Act; investment of funds in qualified investment pools. Authorizes a treasurer to act on behalf of his locality to become a participating political subdivision in qualified investment pools without an ordinance adopted by the locality. The bill defines a qualified investment pool as a jointly administered trust fund that has a professional investment manager. Investments in qualified investment pools pursuant to the bill are required to comply with the requirements of the Investment of Public Funds Act (ยง 2.2-4500 et seq.) applicable to municipal corporations and other political subdivisions. The bill states that none of its provisions shall be construed to diminish existing legal authority of treasurers related to the investment of public funds. This bill is identical to SB 1416.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investment of Public Funds Act; investment of public funds in Virginia Investment Pool Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2105ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2105ER)
2017-02-23HouseEnrolled
2017-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
2017-02-20HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 17105291D-S1 (92-Y 1-N)
2017-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2105S1
2017-02-16SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105291D-S1
2017-02-16SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105291D-S1
2017-02-14SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (92-Y 3-N)
2017-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2105H1
2017-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104744D-H1
2017-02-01HouseRead second time
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104744D-H1
2017-01-30HouseReported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
2017-01-20HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-19HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102038D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224513.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2105
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2105+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2105H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2105S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2105ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2105ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0792+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1001V0019+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H10V0073+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1854+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0261+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0554HB2105+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0597HB2105+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0598HB2105+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0599HB2105+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2498+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2889+HB2105
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1171HB2105+HB2105

Bill Comments 750

feedback