VA HB2105 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Denial of spousal support to spouses convicted of certain violations. Provides that a court shall not award spousal support to a spouse if such spouse was convicted of any violation of Article 4 (Assaults and Bodily Woundings) or Article 7 (Criminal Sexual Assault) of Chapter 4 of Article 18.2 of the Code of Virginia, provided that (i) such violation was against the spouse from whom support is being sought and (ii) the conviction occurred within the five-year period immediately preceding the filing of the petition for divorce or at any time thereafter, unless the spouse seeking support proves by a preponderance of the evidence that a denial of support would be unconscionable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spousal support; denial to spouse convicted of certain violations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2015-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-20HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil Law
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-01-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103366D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback