VA HB2105 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-13)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public utilities; electric vehicle charging service. Excludes any person who is not a public service corporation and who provides electric vehicle charging service at retail from the meaning of the terms "public utility," "public service corporation," or "public service company." The ownership or operation of a facility at which electric vehicle charging service is sold, and the selling of electric vehicle charging service from that facility, does not render the person a public utility, public service corporation, or public service company solely because of that sale, ownership, or operation. The provision of electric vehicle charging service by a person who is not a public utility shall not constitute the retail sale of electricity if the electricity furnished in connection with the provision of electric vehicle charging service is used solely for transportation purposes and the person providing the electric vehicle charging service has procured the furnished electricity from the public utility that is authorized by the State Corporation Commission to engage in the retail sale of electricity within the exclusive service territory in which the service is provided. Providing electric vehicle charging service is declared to be a permitted electric utility activity of a certificated electric utility. The Commission is barred from setting the rates, charges, and fees for the provision of retail electric vehicle charging service provided by nonutilities. The measure directs public utilities to evaluate options to develop and offer off-peak charging rates or other incentives to encourage owners of an electric vehicle to charge or recharge its battery during nonpeak times, when practical. Finally, the measure provides that the Commission is authorized to approve pilot programs conducted by public electric utilities. The pilot programs may offer special rates, contracts, or incentives to determine the feasibility of allowing time-differentiated rates that encourage users of electric motor vehicles to charge vehicles during nonpeak periods. An electric utility that participates in a pilot program will be entitled to recover annually the costs of its participation in such a program conducted on or after January 1, 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric vehicle charging service; excludes certain persons from retail sale of electricity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
2011-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-23 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-23 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-23 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2105ER)
2011-02-23 House: Enrolled
2011-02-17 Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2011-02-17 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-16 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-14 Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2011-02-03 Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2011-02-03 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-02-02 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-02 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-01 House: Printed as engrossed 11103812D-E
2011-02-01 House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2105E
2011-02-01 House: Committee amendment agreed to
2011-02-01 House: Read second time
2011-01-31 House: Read first time
2011-01-27 House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2011-01-12 House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2011-01-12 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103812D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback