VA HB2104 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School crossing zones. Increases the maximum boundaries of a school crossing zone from 600 feet to 750 feet from the limits of school property. School crossing zones. Increases the maximum boundaries of a school crossing zone from 600 feet to 750 feet from the limits of school property.
Title
School crossing zones; signs shall be placed not more than 750 feet from school limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 84 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2104ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2104H1 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104701D-H1 |
2023-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104701D-H1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100880D |