VA HB2104 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2104
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Repeal of the Virginia Highway Corporation Act of 1988; roadways operating under the Highway Corporation Act of 1988 to operate under the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995. Directs the Commissioner of Highways to evaluate whether it is in the public interest for any roadway operated pursuant to the Virginia Highway Corporation Act of 1988 (HCA) to operate instead under the authority and requirements provided by the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995 (PPTA). The bill authorizes the Commissioner, if he determines it is in the public interest for any such roadway to operate under the PPTA and the Secretary of Transportation and the Transportation Public-Private Partnership Steering Committee concur, to negotiate and execute a new comprehensive agreement with the operator of such roadway to operate under the authority and requirements provided by the PPTA and to cease to operate pursuant to the HCA. The bill provides for the repeal of the HCA upon the execution of a comprehensive agreement between the Department of Transportation and the operator of the Dulles Greenway for the Dulles Greenway to operate pursuant to the PPTA. Repeal of the Virginia Highway Corporation Act of 1988; roadways operating under the Highway Corporation Act of 1988 to operate under the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995. Directs the Commissioner of Highways to evaluate whether it is in the public interest for any roadway operated pursuant to the Virginia Highway Corporation Act of 1988 (HCA) to operate instead under the authority and requirements provided by the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995 (PPTA). The bill authorizes the Commissioner, if he determines it is in the public interest for any such roadway to operate under the PPTA and the Secretary of Transportation and the Transportation Public-Private Partnership Steering Committee concur, to negotiate and execute a new comprehensive agreement with the operator of such roadway to operate under the authority and requirements provided by the PPTA and to cease to operate pursuant to the HCA. The bill provides for the repeal of the HCA upon the execution of a comprehensive agreement between the Department of Transportation and the operator of the Dulles Greenway for the Dulles Greenway to operate pursuant to the PPTA.
Title
Virginia Highway Corporation Act of 1988; repeals Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N 1-A) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 9-N 1-A) |
2021-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102481D-E |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2104E |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102481D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2104 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)