VA HB2101 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2101
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0146)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0146)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
GO Virginia Grants; matching funds; sunset. Delays from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022, the sunset of the provision of the Code of Virginia allowing a locality to use grant funds awarded by the Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission as matching funds for GO Virginia grants. GO Virginia Grants; matching funds; sunset. Delays from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022, the sunset of the provision of the Code of Virginia allowing a locality to use grant funds awarded by the Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission as matching funds for GO Virginia grants.
Title
GO Virginia Grants; matching funds, extends sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (84-Y 13-N) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0146) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 146 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2101ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (84-Y 13-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200386D-S1 (84-Y 13-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2101S1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200386D-S1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200386D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 31-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101138D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2101 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)