VA HB2100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local coal severance taxes. Establishes gross receipts for purposes of the local coal severance tax by providing that the only deduction allowed from gross receipts is for non-local transportation and processing costs of coal. The bill establishes a one percent tax on the gross receipts from coal severed from the earth by coal producers, except that the gross receipts tax on coal from mines that sell less than 10,000 tons of coal per month is three-quarters of one percent. The bill also moves the local coal severance taxes out of Chapter 37 of Title 58.1, which sets forth local license tax laws.
Title
Coal severance taxes, local; establishes gross income for certain purposes. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 305 (effective 3/13/13 - see bill) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2100ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2100H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Emergency clause added |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104402D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104402D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #1 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102023D |
Same As/Similar To
SB918 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0618)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 6009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.62 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 361.38 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 361.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1143 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3713 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3713.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3713.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3713.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3713.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3713.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3745 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3930 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3932 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3959 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |