VA HB2099 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limitations on enforcement of judgments; judgment liens; settlement agents. Reduces from 20 years to 10 years from the date of a judgment the period of time within which an execution may be issued or action may be taken on such judgment. The bill provides that the limitation of the enforcement of a judgment may be extended by a recordation of a certificate prior to the expiration period in the clerk's office in which a judgment lien is recorded. The bill provides that such recordation shall extend the limitations period for 10 years from the date of such recordation. Under current law, such limitation period may be extended on motion of the judgment creditor or his assignee. The bill allows a settlement agent or title insurance company to release a judgment lien, in addition to a deed of trust as provided under current law, provided that the obligation secured by such judgment lien has been satisfied by payment made by the settlement agent and whether or not the settlement agent or title insurance company is named as a trustee under such lien or received authority to release such lien. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Limitations on enforcement of judgments; judgment liens; settlement agents. Reduces from 20 years to 10 years from the date of a judgment the period of time within which an execution may be issued or action may be taken on such judgment. The bill provides that the limitation of the enforcement of a judgment may be extended by a recordation of a certificate prior to the expiration period in the clerk's office in which a judgment lien is recorded. The bill provides that such recordation shall extend the limitations period for 10 years from the date of such recordation. Under current law, such limitation period may be extended on motion of the judgment creditor or his assignee. The bill allows a settlement agent or title insurance company to release a judgment lien, in addition to a deed of trust as provided under current law, provided that the obligation secured by such judgment lien has been satisfied by payment made by the settlement agent and whether or not the settlement agent or title insurance company is named as a trustee under such lien or received authority to release such lien. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judgments; limitations on enforcement, judgment liens, settlement agents, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB2099H3
2021-01-26HouseSubstitute by Delegate Coyner agreed to 21103747D-H3
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute rejected 21103259D-H1
2021-01-26HouseRead second time
2021-01-26HouseFloor substitute printed 21103747D-H3 (Coyner)
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseFloor substitute printed 21103614D-H2 (Coyner)
2021-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103259D-H1
2021-01-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102732D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
551339(n/a)See Bill Text
801251(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2099
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2099+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2099H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2099H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2099H3+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103259D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103259.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2099FH3122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0802V0009+HB2099
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0099+HB2099
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1204+HB2099
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0138+HB2099

Bill Comments

feedback