VA HB2099 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of certain revenues by the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority. Allows new sidewalk projects to be funded by the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority.
Title
Use of certain revenues by the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101469D |