VA HB2097 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Treatment services for sexual assault survivors; emergency contraception; provision by health care providers, payment from fund. Requires the State Board of Health to adopt regulations that provide for the administration of emergency contraception by health care providers to survivors of sexual assault if the survivor requests it. The bill modifies the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund so that it pays for such emergency contraception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault survivors; administration of emergency contraception by health care providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2023-02-01HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103070D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192368.11:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192368.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192368.3(n/a)See Bill Text
321162.15:2(n/a)See Bill Text
321162.15:4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback